Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990823

EP0990823 - Shaft sealing assembly and compressor incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
Eagle Industry Co., Ltd.
12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8587 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
EAGLE INDUSTRY Co., Ltd.
12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8587 / JP
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
EAGLE INDUSTRY Co., Ltd.
12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8587 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okuno, Takuya, c/o K.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Masahiro, c/o K.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki S.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Sonobe, Masanori, c/oK.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Morishita, Atsuyuki, c/o K.K.Toyoda Jidoshokki S.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
05 / Chiba, Keiichi, c/o Eagle Industry Co., Ltd.
1-12-15, Shiba-Daimon, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8587 / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119568.601.10.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998028158202.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28158298
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990823
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990823
Date:14.02.2001
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990823
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/32
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/44]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wellendichtung und Verdichter mit einer solchen Dichtung[2000/14]
English:Shaft sealing assembly and compressor incorporating the same[2000/14]
French:Joint à lèvres et compresseur incorporant celui-ci[2000/14]
Examination procedure05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2004Fee for grant paid
19.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0851159  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1,7-10 * column 8, lines 33-56 * * column 10, lines 16-24 * * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 14 * * column 11, lines 36-47 * * figure 6 * [Y] 2,3,5,6;
 [Y]JPH07139633  ;
 []JPH07139633  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [ ] * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5607168  (DAHLL HANS H [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 15-17 * * column 1, lines 40-43 * * column 4, lines 18-28 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5183271  (WADA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,8 * column 1, lines 14-36 * * column 1, lines 50-56 * * column 2, lines 1-10 * * column 7, lines 21-25 * * figures 1,5,10 *;
 [A]US5056799  (TAKENAKA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, lines 63-68 * * column 3, lines 15-19 * * figures 1,3 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [Y] 2,3,5,6 * abstract *