blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995476
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59911315D 27.01.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE29818485 16.10.1998
DE59911315 02.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995476Global Dossier 22.12.2004B1
EP0995476 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE29818485 16.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE29818485U 17.12.1998U1
Priority number Date
DE29818485 16.10.1998