Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995476

EP0995476 - Filter for the separation of liquids from gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mann + Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2003/51]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Filterwerk Mann & Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Görg, Günter
Mörikestrasse 9
71696 Möglingen / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Voth, Gerhard
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [2000/17]Voth, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09
71631 Ludwigsburg / DE
Application number, filing date99119579.302.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE1998218485U16.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818485 U
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995476
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995476
Date:22.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D39/00, B01D17/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filter zum Abscheiden von Flüssigkeiten aus Gasen[2000/17]
English:Filter for the separation of liquids from gases[2000/17]
French:Filtre de séparation des liquides contenues dans dans de gaz[2000/17]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2004Fee for grant paid
19.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Request for further processing for:10.04.2003Request for further processing filed
16.04.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.05.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT22.12.2004
ES02.04.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/12]ES02.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3128748  (INST TEXTIL & FASERFORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 11; figure 1; claim - *