blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0993126

EP0993126 - Antenna holding device and method for mounting antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagaike, Syotaro
2-11-15, Tsunashimanishi, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-0053 / JP
02 / Inomata, Yoji
3-9-62, Hashido, Seya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 246-0037 / JP
[2000/16]
Former [2000/15]01 / Nagaike, Syotaro
2-11-5, Tsunashimanishi, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-0053 / JP
02 / Inomata, Yoji
3-9-62, Hashido, Seya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 246-0037 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119632.004.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998029756706.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29756798
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993126
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993126
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04B1/38, H01Q1/24
[2000/15]
CPC:
H01Q1/1207 (EP,US); H01Q1/242 (EP,US); Y10S439/916 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Befestigung einer Antenne[2000/15]
English:Antenna holding device and method for mounting antenna[2000/15]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour la fixation d'une antenne[2000/15]
Examination procedure25.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
07.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
17.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/14]
07.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29505015U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4 * page 1, line 5 - line 28 ** page 3, line 11 - line 35; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0773632  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 31 - line 54 * * column 7, line 37 - line 59; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0831549  (NIPPON ANTENA KABUSHIKI KAISYA [JP]) [A] 4 * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 5; figure 11 *;
 [X]WO9813903  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, line 12 - line 35 * * page 4, line 11 - line 20 * * page 5, line 7 - line 9; figures 1-3,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.