Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992351

EP0992351 - System for making heat-sensitive stencil master [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Riso Kagaku Corporation
2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105 / JP
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Oike, Hikaru, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Irie, Yukio, c/o Riso Kagaku Corporation
1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119704.705.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028385506.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28385598
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992351
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992351
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J3/24, B41C1/14, B41J2/335, B41J2/36
[2000/42]
Former International [2000/15]B41J3/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Herstellung einer wärmeempfindlichen Druckschablone[2000/15]
English:System for making heat-sensitive stencil master[2000/15]
French:Système pour fabriquer un support stencil thermique[2000/15]
Examination procedure05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
03.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.08.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
06.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/04]
24.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5809879  (YOKOYAMA YASUMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * * column 14, line 34 - column 17, line 17 * * figures 16,17,20; claim - * [A] 2,5;
 [X]US5355793  (SATO MASAMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - line 40 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5592209  (HASEGAWA TAKANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH01238956  ;
 [A]US5537140  (HAYASHI JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 2,5 * abstract * * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 33 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US5729274  (SATO MASAMICHI [JP]) [A] 2,5 * column 4, line 8 - line 28 * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891215), vol. 013, no. 567, Database accession no. (M - 908), [A] 1,4 * abstract *