blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995624 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995624



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 124
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
26.03.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.01.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.11.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.11.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.11.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
14.03.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 12
28.11.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.11.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 14
03.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 23
05.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
05.10.1999 Description Search / examination 13
05.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 5
05.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6