blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995624


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.06.2008 Change - applicant published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
26.03.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
04.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
27.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.10.2002 Renewal fee
28.03.2002 Change - representative published on  15.05.2002  [2002/20]
23.11.2001 Change - applicant published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
03.10.2001 Renewal fee
18.01.2001 Change - extension states
08.12.2000 Request for examination filed published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
24.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]