blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995624
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59905628D 26.06.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE59905628 05.10.1999
DE19848087 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000118259Global Dossier 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19848087 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995624Global Dossier 21.05.2003B1
EP0995624 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19848087 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19848087 20.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19848087 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20000029165 25.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19848087 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6276229 21.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE19848087 19.10.1998