Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995624

EP0995624 - Accelerator pedal module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Göhring, Frank
Jahnstrasse 9
60318 Frankfurt / DE
02 / Wendling, Armin
Schmiedeweg 4
56290 Beltheim-Mannebach / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2000/17]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99119724.505.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814808719.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848087
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995624
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995624
Date:21.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K26/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrpedalmodul[2000/17]
English:Accelerator pedal module[2000/17]
French:Pédale d'accélérateur modulaire[2000/17]
Examination procedure25.02.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2003Fee for grant paid
17.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19521821  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4300096  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE19517172