Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994197

EP0994197 - Steel alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 26.06.2013  [2013/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENTELER AG
Residenzstrasse 1
D-33104 Paderborn / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Töpker, Dieter Dr.
Bekscher Berg 7
33100 Paderborn / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Ksoll, Peter
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Ksoll, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date99119739.305.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE1998218244U13.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818244 U
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994197
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994197
Date:20.12.2006
[2006/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994197
Date:03.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/04, C22C38/38
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Stahllegierung[2000/16]
English:Steel alloy[2000/16]
French:Alliage d'acier[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.01.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
21.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2010Fee for grant paid
02.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
01.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
13.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
[2013/26]
Former [2012/03]DK03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/40]DK03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/35]FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/29]FI03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
GR04.02.2011
PT03.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH07197186  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3 *Zusammenfassung*;; tables 1-4 *;
 [PA]EP0614495  (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [PA] 1-3 *ganz Dokument*;
 [A]JPH04235253  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-3 *Zusammenfassung* * examples 1-5; tables 1,5 *;
 [A]JPH07197184  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-3 *Zusammenfassung* * table 1 *;
 [A]JPH08277437  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1 *Zusammenfassung* * examples 1-11; table 1 * * examples 12-22; table 2 *