Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992537

EP0992537 - Oil extended rubber and rubber composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JSR Corporation
6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
JSR Corporation
6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-0045 / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
JSR Corporation
11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tadaki, Toshihiro, c/o JSR CORPORATION
2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Naokazu, c/o JSR CORPORATION
2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Akema, Hiroshi, c/o JSR CORPORATION
2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/15]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119785.606.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028575107.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28575198
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992537
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992537
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L19/00, C08L9/06, B60C1/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ölgestreckter Gummi und Gummizusammensetzung[2000/15]
English:Oil extended rubber and rubber composition[2000/15]
French:Caoutchouc étendu à l'huile et composition de caoutchouc[2000/15]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2004Fee for grant paid
12.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09235323  ;
 [X]EP0849321  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * page 14, line 6; claims 5,8,12; tables 1,3 *;
 [PX]EP0924227  (JSR CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-10 * page 7, line 47; claims 1,3,6-8; tables 1,7,12,13 *;
 [PX]EP0916699  (JSR CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-6,8-10 * page 4, line 24; claim - *;
 [A]JPS5938209
 [X]  - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 46, Database accession no. 498360, XP002128230 & JPH09235323 A 19970909 (JAPANESE GEON CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 15, Database accession no. 1984-091610, XP002128231 & JPS5938209 A 19840302 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract *