Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996267

EP0996267 - Interface device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2016Revocation of patentpublished on 23.11.2016  [2016/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2014/24]
Former [2002/11]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Görtz, Udo
Im Haarmannsbusch 154
44797 Bochum / DE
02 / Theimer, Wolfgang
Weifeldweg 21
44795 Bochum / DE
03 / Salomäki, Ari
Dessauer Strasse 6
44866 Bochum / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/28]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/17]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119786.406.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE1998104879122.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848791
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996267
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996267
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996267
Date:03.09.2008
Language:DE
[2008/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/00, H04B1/38, G08G1/09
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Schnittstelleneinrichtung[2000/17]
English:Interface device[2000/17]
French:Dispositif d'interface[2000/17]
Examination procedure08.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
24.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2008Fee for grant paid
21.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2009   
Funkwerk Dabendorf GmbH
Märkische Strasse
15806 Dabendorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard, et al
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/28]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2009   
Funkwerk Dabendorf GmbH
Märkische Strasse
15806 Dabendorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard, et al
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48
12489 Berlin / DE
10.07.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.12.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.07.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/47]
Appeal following opposition23.02.2012Appeal received No.  T0438/12
23.04.2012Statement of grounds filed
26.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
26.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
AT06.10.2008
LU06.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
FR02.11.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2011/25]CY03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
AT06.10.2008
LU06.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
SE03.12.2008
GR04.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2010/44]CY03.09.2008
DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
AT06.10.2008
LU06.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2010/28]DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
AT06.10.2008
LU06.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2010/19]DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
AT06.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
SE03.12.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2010/06]DK03.09.2008
FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
IT03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/30]FI03.09.2008
IE03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
MC31.10.2008
ES14.12.2008
PT03.02.2009
Former [2009/12]FI03.09.2008
NL03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL03.09.2008
ES14.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5479479  (BRAITBERG ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 10, line 10 - column 15, line 61; figures 14-17 * [A] 3-6;
 [A]US5794164  (BECKERT ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 65 - column 13, line 22; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]  - RUEHL ET AL, "SPS51 - A UNIVERSAL INTERFACE FOR HANDS-FREE TELEPHONY, SPEECH RECOGNITION AND SPEECH STORAGE IN THE CAR TELEPHONE", PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, PHILIPS TELECOMMUNICATIE INDUSTRIE N.V. HILVERSUM, NL, (19901201), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 1 - 9, XP000178585 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *