Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1008855

EP1008855 - Sensor ring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 26.01.2011  [2011/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2006/25]
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Guth, Wolfgang, Dr.
Kirchenstrasse 33
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[2000/24]
Application number, filing date99119800.306.10.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateDE199815649808.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19856498
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1008855
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1008855
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1008855
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01P1/04, G01P3/44, G01P1/00, G01P3/487
[2001/13]
Former International [2000/24]G01P1/04, G01P3/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:Sensorring[2000/24]
English:Sensor ring[2000/24]
French:Bague de capteur[2000/24]
Examination procedure20.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
27.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2006Fee for grant paid
23.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.02.2007  21.02.2007  ADMISSIBLE
DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH
Postfach 1260
83292 Traunreut / DE
 [2007/18]
02.05.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.09.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.09.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
FR21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
BE31.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
[2010/06]
Former [2009/02]CY21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
FR21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2008/52]FI21.06.2006
FR21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2008/36]FI21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
LU06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/22]FI21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/21]FI21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2008/17]FI21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
AT06.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/30]FI21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IE21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/18]FI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/02]FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE21.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4835505  (HATTORI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 32 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 15; figures 3-16 *;
 [Y]EP0725242  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 28 - line 49 *;
 [Y]JPS6326532
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880705), vol. 012, no. 233, Database accession no. (P - 724), [Y] 2,3 * abstract *