Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022483

EP1022483 - Switchable twin chamber mounting with hydraulic damping [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2002/04]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Heinz
Beethovenstrasse 25A
69502 Hemsbach / DE
02 / Rudolf, Hans-Joachim
Am Tannenkamp 14
26935 Stadland / DE
[2000/30]
Application number, filing date99119805.206.10.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateDE199910249322.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19902493
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022483
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022483
Date:16.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/26
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Umschaltbares Zweikammer-Stützlager mit hydraulischer Dämpfung[2000/30]
English:Switchable twin chamber mounting with hydraulic damping[2000/30]
French:Support de montage commutable à amortissement hydraulique et à deux chambres[2000/30]
Examination procedure01.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
06.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2004Fee for grant paid
26.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT06.10.2005
[2007/34]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0840035  (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 1-20; figure - *;
 [DA]DE4141332  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0821181  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, lines 30-51; figure - *
ExaminationDE19902493
by applicantDE4141332
 DE19807868