Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992372

EP0992372 - Vehicle suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku
Tokyo-To / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku
Tokyo-To / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuruta, Mikio, c/o FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-TO / JP
02 / Kawabe, Hiroyuki, c/o FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-TO / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Yoshimitsu, c/o FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-TO / JP
04 / Matsumoto, Shin, c/o FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-TO / JP
05 / Yoshida, Michiru, c/o FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.
7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-TO / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Sajda, Wolf E. , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119806.006.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028574107.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28574198
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992372
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992372
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60G13/18, F16F7/108
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugaufhängungssystem[2000/15]
English:Vehicle suspension system[2000/15]
French:Système de suspension de véhicule[2000/15]
Examination procedure29.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2003Fee for grant paid
04.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAY]FR2535259  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10,13 * page 2, line 1 - line 11; figure 1 * [A] 2,11 [Y] 12;
 [XY]JPH0268212
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900525), vol. 014, no. 247, Database accession no. (M - 0978), [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * [Y] 12