blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974306 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974306



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 355
06.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
06.10.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
06.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
06.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Description Search / examination 5
06.10.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 32
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 35
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 30
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 29
09.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
09.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 19
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.02.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.07.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2002 Description Search / examination 3
25.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
05.11.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
05.11.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.11.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.12.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 10
17.01.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
06.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.03.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.04.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1