blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974306


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
02.04.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.05.2004  [2004/21]
15.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
04.04.2003 Change - classification published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
04.04.2003 Change - classification published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
14.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2003 Change - applicant published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
29.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.09.2002 Change - German title published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
14.08.2002 Renewal fee
02.08.2002 Examination report or reply
22.03.2002 First examination report
19.03.2002 Examination report or reply
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
16.10.2000 Change - extension states
25.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  11.10.2000 [2000/41]
09.08.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
17.12.1999 Change - classification published on  02.02.2000 [2000/05]
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
12.11.1999 Renewal fee