blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0974306

Designated contracting states DE 
 DKLapse: 28.08.2003
 GB 
Examination procedure06.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted28.05.2003
Opposition procedure02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 19.05.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:818180
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE DK GB
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;RO;SI
 
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7A 61B 17/36 A, 7A 61B 1/00 B, 7A 61B 17/22 B, 7A 61M 1/00 B
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000210
 
Event date:11.10.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE DK GB
 
Event date:08.05.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020322
 
Event date:05.03.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:PENTAX CORPORATION
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61B 18/00 A
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61B 1/00 B
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61B 17/22 B
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7A 61M 1/00 B
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0818180
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE DK GB
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:03.07.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69722459
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030703
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:28.08.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030828
 
Event date:19.05.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040302
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20080716
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:24.03.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20090710
 
Event date:31.05.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090710
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20100707
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.04.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120201
 
Event date:10.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69722459 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20120201