Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974306

EP0974306 - Treatment accessory for endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pentax Corporation
2-36-9, Maeno-cho, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
Pentax Corporation
2-36-9, Maeno-cho, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ASAHI KOGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
36-9, Maeno-cho 2-chome Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ouchi, Teruo, c/o Asahi Kogaku Kogyo K. K.
36-9, Maenocho 2-chome, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119812.810.07.1997
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1996018040910.07.1996         Original published format: JP 18040996
JP1996018041010.07.1996         Original published format: JP 18041096
JP1996018041110.07.1996         Original published format: JP 18041196
JP1996028042523.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28042596
JP1996028042623.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28042696
JP1996028042723.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28042796
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974306
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974306
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/00, A61B1/00, A61B17/22, A61M1/00
[2003/21]
Former International [2000/05]A61B17/36, A61B1/00, A61B17/22, A61M1/00
Former International [2000/04]A61B18/00, A61B1/00, A61B17/22, A61M1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behandlungszubehör für ein Endoskop[2002/46]
English:Treatment accessory for endoscope[2000/04]
French:Accessoire de traitement pour un endoscope[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]Behandlungszubehör für einen Endoskop
Examination procedure10.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
22.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2003Fee for grant paid
06.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97111773.4  / EP0818180
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK28.08.2003
[2004/23]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4393872  (REZNIK BENJAMIN, et al) [A] 1-5,8 * column W *;
 [A]US4650466  (LUTHER RONALD B [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 5 - line 34 * * column 3, line 3 - line 6 *;
 [A]US4655219  (PETRUZZI CLAUDE E [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9205828  (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 27, line 5 - line 34 * * page 32, line 26 - page 33, line 11 * * claims 1,4,38,41 * * figures 31-36 *