Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992377

EP0992377 - Thermostatic device for the recovery of heat from the exhaust gases of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR S.A.
8, rue Louis-Lormand
78321 La Verrière / FR
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Ap, Ngy Srun
30, avenue des Buissons
78420 Saint Rémy les Chevreuse / FR
02 / Jouanny, Philippe
47, rue Moliére
78280 Guyancourt / FR
[2000/19]
Former [2000/15]01 / Ap, Ngy Srun
30, avenue des Buissons
78420 Saint Rémy les Chevreuse / FR
02 / Jouanny, Philippe
3, square du Lyonnais
78310 Maurepas / FR
Application number, filing date99119816.907.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateFR1998001256607.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812566
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992377
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/02
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Thermostatische Wärmerückgewinnungsanlage aus Fahrzeugabgasen[2000/15]
English:Thermostatic device for the recovery of heat from the exhaust gases of a vehicle[2000/15]
French:Dispositif thermostatique de récupération de la chaleur des gaz d'échappement d'un véhicule[2000/15]
Examination procedure11.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
23.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/18]
30.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/18]
Request for further processing for:23.11.2004Request for further processing filed
23.11.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR1106125  (DEWANDRE CO LTD C) [X] 1,2,7 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - page 2, column L; figure . * [Y] 6;
 [Y]FR1454286  (A.L. KIEN) [Y] 6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2017579  (ANDERSON SAMUEL M) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, line 49 - page 2, column L, line 4; figure 2 *