Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973016

EP0973016 - Device for transmission of a measured value between sensors and a monitor unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peter Lancier Maschinenbau-Hafenhütte GmbH & Co. KG
Petersheide 37
48167 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Peter Lancier Maschinenbau-Hafenhütte GmbH & Co. KG
Petersheide 37
48167 Münster / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vemmer, Helmut Dipl.-Ing.
Ohlingserstrasse 1
42329 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Wernsmann, Alfons Dipl.-Ing.
Schagern 5
48612 Horstmar / DE
03 / Jahnk, Volker Dipl.-Ing.
Alter Milchhof 5
48145 Münster / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Hoffmeister, Helmut
Patentanwalt
Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36
48147 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date99119844.108.04.1994
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE1993431283720.04.1993         Original published format: DE 4312837
DE1993431284120.04.1993         Original published format: DE 4312841
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973016
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973016
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01F15/06
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   PT,   SE [2002/29]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Messwertübertragung zwischen Sensoren und einer Überwachungseinheit[2000/03]
English:Device for transmission of a measured value between sensors and a monitor unit[2000/03]
French:Dispositif pour la transmission de valeurs de mesure entre détecteurs et une unité de surveillance[2000/03]
Examination procedure02.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/08]
17.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/08]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94105427.2  / EP0621464
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
17.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.06.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4918995  (PEARMAN ARTHUR N J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 10, line 6; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US4630221  (HECKENBACH TERRY A [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0180540  (INGKO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 9 - page 12, line 9; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3939038  (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 7 - line 8 * * column 3, line 2 - line 24; figure . *;
 [A]EP0458995  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 17; figure . *;
 [A]JPS60123733
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851108), vol. 9, no. 281, Database accession no. (P - 403)<2004> , [A] 1 * abstract *