Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992983

EP0992983 - Data read and write apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd.
8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Yamaichi Electronics Co., Ltd.
28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/06]For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd.
8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho
Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Yamaichi Electronics Co., Ltd.
28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Mitsumi Electric Company Ltd.
8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho
Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Smartdisk International Inc.
3506 Mercantile Avenue
Naples, FL 34104 / US
For all designated states
YAMAICHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Higashi, Yoshitaka, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
02 / Seno, Koichi, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
03 / Komatsu, Hisateru, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
04 / Yajima, Toshio
2-1-903, Yamate 2-chome
Funabashi-shi, Chiba / JP
05 / Ito, Toshiyasu
28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome
Ota-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/21]
Former [2000/15]01 / Higashi, Yoshitaka, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
02 / Seno, Koichi, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
03 / Komatsu, Hisateru, c/o Tendo Factory
1-1, Bandai
Tendo-shi, Yamagata / JP
04 / Yajima, Toshio
/ / JP
05 / Ito, Toshiyasu
28-7, Nakamagome 3-chome, Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119852.407.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028700508.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28700598
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992983
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992983
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/00, G11B23/00, G11B23/03, G06K19/077, G11C5/14, G06F3/06
[2001/27]
Former International [2000/15]G11B5/00, G11B23/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/13]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenlese- und Schreibgerät[2000/15]
English:Data read and write apparatus[2000/15]
French:Appareil de lecture et d'enregistrement de données[2000/15]
Examination procedure03.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
08.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
01.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4036336  (SMARTDISKETTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 17 - column 225 * * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3903454  (EISELE RAYMUND H [DE]) [A] 1-16;
 [Y]US5471038  (EISELE RAYMUND H [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5584043  (BURKART AXEL E [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]JPH07192451  ;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, [Y] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - "TURN FLOPPY DRIVES INTO CARD READERS", INDUSTRY WEEK,US,PENTON PUBLISHING, INC, (19970317), vol. 246, no. 6, ISSN 0039-0895, page 32, XP000736237