EP1003130 - Video game device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2007/25] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-2, Minatojimanakamachi 7-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimomura, Satoshi 2-15-3 Sakuragaoka Tama-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119906.8 | 08.10.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | JP19980287131 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28713198 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003130 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003130 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003130 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/70, G06T1/60 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G06T13/00 (EP,US);
A63F2300/66 (EP,US);
G06T2200/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | G06T15/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/02] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Videospielvorrichtung | [2000/21] | English: | Video game device | [2000/21] | French: | Dispositif de jeu vidéo | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4961153 (FREDRICKSON ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** column 2, line 5 - line 25 *; | [X]US5561745 (JACKSON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,11 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 22; figures 1,2,5 * * column 7, line 30 - line 36 *; | [X]EP0807902 (CYBERCLASS LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,4,6-9,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 3; claims 9-16 * |