blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995658


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
17.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
03.12.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
04.10.2002 First examination report
27.09.2002 Examination report or reply
30.10.2001 Renewal fee
18.01.2001 Change - extension states
24.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
21.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]