blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995658
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995658Global Dossier 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU746282B 18.04.2002B2
AU5019499 20.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9905599 29.08.2000A
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2257711 26.03.2002C
CA2257711 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6189714 20.02.2001B1
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9905778 29.03.2000B
Priority number Date
US17496998 19.10.1998