Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995658

EP0995658 - Device for a brake pipe hose connection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE COMPANY
1000 Air Brake Avenue
Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Gaughan, Edward W.
RD 1, Box 199W
Greensburg, Pennsylvania 15601 / US
02 / Kettle, Paul J., Jr
3137 Pheasant Run
Ijamsville, Maryland 21754 / US
03 / Cohen, Jonathan A.
3705 Capulet Terrace
Silver Spring, Maryland 20906 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Petri, Stellan
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Petri, Stellan
Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date99119943.111.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017496919.10.1998         Original published format: US 174969
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995658
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T17/04
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für eine Verbindung von Bremsleitungsschläuchen[2000/17]
English:Device for a brake pipe hose connection[2000/17]
French:Dispositif pour la connexion d'un tuyau souple de frein[2000/17]
Examination procedure08.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
02.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/35]
20.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5683148  (LI WEI [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18 * column 5, line 18 - line 44 * * column 5, line 52 - line 59; figures 1-5,9 *;
 [A]US4763875  (CHEW JAMES P [US]) [A] 1,10,18 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 67; figure 1 *