Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994646

EP0994646 - Illumination for use in electronic component mounting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamagata Casio Co., Ltd.
5400-1, Higashine-ko Higashine-shi
Yamagata 999-3701 / JP
[2007/08]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Yamagata Casio Co., Ltd.
5400-1, Higashine-ko
Higashine-shi, Yamagata 999-3701 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Mahito
14 Azuma-cho 3-chome
Yamagata-shi, Yamagata 930-2491 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119950.612.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029049113.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29049198
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994646
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994646
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/08, G01N21/88
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beleuchtung zur Anwendung in einer Bestückungsvorrichtung für elektronische Bauteile[2006/38]
English:Illumination for use in electronic component mounting apparatus[2000/16]
French:Illumination à utiliser dans un appareil de montage de composants électroniques[2000/16]
Former [2000/16]Beleuchtung zur Anwendung in einer elektronischen Bauteilenbestückungsvorrichtung
Examination procedure12.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2007Fee for grant paid
03.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT21.02.2007
ES01.06.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2008/17]ES01.06.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07174532  ;
 [YA]JPH1048504  ;
 [A]JPH05175697  ;
 [A]JPH09321494  ;
 [A]JPH05327292  ;
 [A]JPH09282444  ;
 US5923772  [ ] (FUKUDA SHOZO [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * figure 1 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07174532 A 19950714 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,12,15 * abstract * [Y] 3-5,7-9,11,13,16
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10048504 A 19980220 (COPAL CO LTD) [Y] 3-5,7-9,11,13,16 * abstract * [A] 12,15
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931022), vol. 017, no. 583, Database accession no. (E - 1452), & JP05175697 A 19930713 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,3-5,12,13,15,16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09321494 A 19971212 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,12,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940311), vol. 018, no. 148, Database accession no. (E - 1522), & JP05327292 A 19931210 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,7,8,12,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09282444 A 19971031 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 14 * abstract *