Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994540

EP0994540 - Automatic wire cutting and terminating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2007/22]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nomoto, Yoshiaki
206-1 Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken 421-0407 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119987.813.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029103313.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29103398
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994540
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994540
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R43/28, H01R43/048, H01R43/052, H01R43/05
[2001/15]
Former International [2000/16]H01R43/28, H01R43/048
Designated contracting statesCH,   LI [2002/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatisches Drahtschneide- und Anschliessgerät[2000/16]
English:Automatic wire cutting and terminating apparatus[2000/16]
French:Appareil de coupage et de terminaison automatique de fils[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
27.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/48]
08.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4506566  (SCHMID HANS [CH]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 64 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3;
 [X]US5168611  (HORNUNG CRAIG W [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - line 54 * * column 3, line 5 - line 31 * * figures 5,6 *