Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996294

EP0996294 - Method and apparatus for audio signal processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA, INC.
5030 Sugarloaf Parkway
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Scientific-Atlanta, Inc.
5030 Sugarloaf Parkway
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC.
One Technology Parkway South
Norcross, Georgia 30092 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LaFay, William P.
1995 Clipper Straits
Snellville, GA 30078 / US
02 / Cheng, Robert C.
5806 Tree Summit Parkway
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
03 / Hsu, Benny
770 Deer Oaks Drive
Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US
04 / Taylor, Martin
1177 Justin Lane
Lithonia, GA 30058 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99120007.214.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017667621.10.1998         Original published format: US 176676
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996294
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996294
Date:21.11.2001
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N17/00, H04N5/60
[2001/47]
Former International [2000/17]H04N17/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/32]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Tonsignalverarbeitung[2000/17]
English:Method and apparatus for audio signal processing[2000/17]
French:Méthode et appareil de traitement de signal audio[2000/17]
Examination procedure17.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
19.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/43]
07.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0519667  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,13,14,17 * the whole document *