EP0994168 - Substrate film for adhesive sheet and adhesive sheet using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Yoshihide c/o Nitto Denko Corp., 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Okada, Katsuhiro c/o Nitto Denko Corp., 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120032.0 | 18.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | JP19980295377 | 16.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29537798 | JP19990018750 | 27.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1875099 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994168 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994168 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994168 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C09J7/25 (EP,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,US);
C09J2475/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24421 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L75/08, C08L2666/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/41] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Träger für Klebefilm und Klebefilm auf Basis dieses Trägers | [2000/16] | English: | Substrate film for adhesive sheet and adhesive sheet using the same | [2000/16] | French: | Support pour film adhésif et film adhésif utilisant ledit support | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 11.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH106442 ; | [X]JPS5669158 ; | [A]GB1226841 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON) [A] 1-7,11,12 * page 2, line 113 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 98 - line 101 *; | [A]CH579626 (BEIERSDORF AG) [A] 1-7,11 * example 1 *; | [X]US4769283 (SIPINEN ALAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - line 42 * * column 3, line 19 - line 25 * * column 6, line 39 - line 42 *; | [X]WO9712006 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1,5,11 * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 5, paragraphs 4,5 *; | [X]DE19630231 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,11,12 * claims 1,3,9 * * example 2 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10006442 A 19980113 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,8,9,11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 30, Database accession no. 1981-54284D, XP002152540 & JPS5669158 A 19810610 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [X] 1,9,11 * abstract * |