blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995452


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
21.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.08.2006  [2006/34]
04.03.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
07.12.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.11.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.11.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2002 Renewal fee
21.12.2001 Change - extension states
30.10.2001 Renewal fee
17.08.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2001 [2001/40]
01.12.2000 Publication of search report published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
17.11.2000 Change - classification published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
09.03.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)