blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995452
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995452Global Dossier 17.01.2001A3
EP0995452 26.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
US17523398 20.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6423038 23.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
US17523398 20.10.1998