Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995452

EP0995452 - Topical intra-uterine anesthesia device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vancaillie, Thierry G.
60, Sugarloaf Crescent
Castlecrag NSW 2068 / AU
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/17]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120072.619.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017523320.10.1998         Original published format: US 175233
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995452
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995452
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M3/04, A61M19/00, A61M3/02
[2001/01]
Former International [2000/17]A61M3/04, A61M19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/40]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur örtliche intrauterine Anästhesiebehandlung und deren Verfahren[2000/17]
English:Topical intra-uterine anesthesia device[2000/17]
French:Dispositif d'anesthésie locale intra-utérine[2000/17]
Examination procedure17.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
22.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
10.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.03.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.03.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4071027  (MEADOR LAWRENCE DEAN) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [X]US4432758  (FINEGOLD AARON N [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]BE633372  (TOBIE MERTENS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 13; figure - *;
 [Y]US5338297  (KOCUR WALTER [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 25 - line 37; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US5569241  (EDWARDS STUART D [US]) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 9 - line 10; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE3516830  (HUBMANN MAX, et al) [Y] 6 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3626928  (BARRINGER HULBERT VAN RENSSELA, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 17; figure 2 *