Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996077

EP0996077 - Optical scanner code reader and bar code reader having increased degree of freedom in placement of optical parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/39]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohkawa, Masanori
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / Ichikawa, Toshiyuki
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
03 / Watanuki, Hiroshi
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
04 / Yamazaki, Kozo
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Sunderland, James Harry , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Sunderland, James Harry , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99120078.320.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998029962121.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29962198
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996077
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996077
Date:16.08.2000
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996077
Date:26.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10, G07G1/00
[2000/32]
Former International [2000/17]G06K7/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/18]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Abtasteinrichtung, Kodeleser und Strichkodeleser mit erhöhtem Freiheitsgrad zur Positionierung von optischen Bauteilen[2000/17]
English:Optical scanner code reader and bar code reader having increased degree of freedom in placement of optical parts[2000/17]
French:Système de balayage optique, lecteur de code, lecteur de code à barres, à degrée de liberté élevé du placement des pièces optiques[2000/17]
Examination procedure04.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
09.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2007Fee for grant paid
25.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02017773.9  / EP1260932
Opposition(s)27.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36]
Request for further processing for:08.09.2006Request for further processing filed
08.09.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.09.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9401835  (SPECTRA PHYSICS SCANNING SYST [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8,11-13,16-19,24 * page 5, line 3 - line 15 * * page 6, line 9 - line 18 * * page 9, line 18 - line 34 * * page 16, line 4 - line 17 * * figures 2-4,20 * [A] 15;
 [XA]EP0772147  (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 4-7,9,16,17 * page 2, line 41 - line 48 * * page 3, line 29 - line 48 * * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 19 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 20-22;
 [X]EP0779591  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 10 * figure 27 *;
 [Y]EP0811958  (NCR INT INC [US]) [Y] 3 * column 8, line 1 - line 13 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4093865  (NICKL FRANKLYN GEORGE) [Y] 3 * column 9, line 56 - line 67 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US5825010  (CHARYCH HAL [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 4, line 26 - line 33 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19545137  (STRATMANN CRISTOFFER [DE]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 49 - line 56 * * column 5, line 8 - line 12 * * figure 2 *