Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090713

EP1090713 - Accessory with a hand routing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/15]Accessory for hand routing machines
[2004/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TTS Tooltechnic Systems AG & Co. KG
Wertstrasse 20
73240 Wendlingen / DE
[2004/15]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Arlart, Gerhard
Hauptstrasse 73
75305 Neuenbürg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Arlart, Gerhard
Hauptstrasse 73
75305 Neuenburg / DE
 [2004/15]
Former [2001/15]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Reimold, Otto , et al
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]Reimold, Otto, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date99120105.408.10.1999
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1090713
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1090713
Date:26.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q9/00
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Fräshilfe mit einer Handoberfräse[2004/03]
English:Accessory with a hand routing machine[2004/04]
French:Accessoire avec une machine à fraiser manuelles[2004/03]
Former [2001/15]Fräshilfe für Handoberfräsen
Former [2001/15]Accessory for hand routing machines
Former [2001/15]Accessoire pour machines à fraiser manuelles
Examination procedure11.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
28.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
10.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2004Fee for grant paid
16.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2002
31.10.200204   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2003
31.10.200305   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
FR26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
IT26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
AT08.10.2004
LU08.10.2004
PT26.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]CY26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
FR26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
AT08.10.2004
LU08.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/14]FI26.05.2004
FR26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
AT08.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]FI26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
AT08.10.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/12]FI26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
BE31.10.2004
CH31.10.2004
LI31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/51]FI26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
BE31.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI26.05.2004
GB26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/19]FI26.05.2004
IE26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/18]FI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
ES06.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE26.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US1745780  (CASEY WILLIAM P) [A] 1 * page 2, line 70 - line 109; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5094279  (DICKEY JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 46 - line 52; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]DE9000210U  (FESTO KG) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraphs 1,2; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5318082  (VON HOLLEN HENRY J [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 35 - line 38 * * column 6, line 35 - line 39 * * column 6, line 51 - line 56 * * figures 3A,6,7 *