Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995872

EP0995872 - Door or window hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Niemann, Hans Dieter
Am Hügel 17
50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
[2006/22]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Niemann, Hans-Dieter
Am Hügel 17
D-50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Oberwalleney, Ewald
Backheinsfeld 6
40878 Ratingen / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel
Patentanwälte
Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2000/17]Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler, Dipl.-Ing. Michael Füssel, Brahmsstrasse 29
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99120116.108.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE1998218984U24.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818984 U
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995872
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995872
Date:13.03.2002
[2002/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995872
Date:31.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05D7/04, E05D5/06
[2002/11]
Former International [2000/17]E05D5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Tür- oder Fensterband[2000/17]
English:Door or window hinge[2000/17]
French:Penture de porte ou de fenêtre[2000/17]
Examination procedure26.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
22.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2006Fee for grant paid
14.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
LU08.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT31.10.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
LU08.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2008/21]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2008/17]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/18]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/02]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE31.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0940541  (HAHN GMBH & CO KG DR [DE]) [XP] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 17; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [XY]EP0837205  (SIMONSWERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10,11 * column 3, line 1 - line 13; figure - * [Y] 6;
 [X]EP0318422  (SCHUERING FENSTERTECH) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 7; figure 2 *;
 [XY]FR2088762  (BOTTAZZO LAMBERTO) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,7 * [Y] 6