blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994212 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994212



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
06.02.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.12.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.09.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.09.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.09.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
17.05.2002 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
07.05.2002 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
27.03.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.03.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
27.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
27.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.10.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 11
08.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Description Search / examination 6
08.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.10.1999 General authorisation Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6