blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0994212
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59904821D 08.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE19846575 12.10.1998
DE59904821 08.10.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0994212Global Dossier 02.04.2003B1
EP0994212 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19846575 12.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19846575 27.04.2000C1
Priority number Date
DE19846575 12.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2196694T 16.12.2003T3
Priority number Date
DE19846575 12.10.1998