blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0994212

Designated contracting states CH 
 DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 LI 
Examination procedure13.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted02.04.2003
Opposition procedure05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 24.03.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):CH DE ES FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:13.12.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20001019
 
Event date:03.01.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:CH DE ES FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:08.05.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.
 
Event date:02.04.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):CH DE ES FR GB IT LI
 
Event date:02.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:15.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:08.05.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59904821
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030508
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:30.05.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO
 
Event date:30.07.2003 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
 
Event date:16.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2196694 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:02.01.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:24.03.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040105
 
Event date:15.04.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH
Free Format Text:SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)
 
Event date:15.09.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH
Free Format Text:MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE)
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:05.11.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:27.02.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20081027
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20081021
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20081024
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCAR
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20091026
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:29.01.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20091015
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20091023
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.07.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100630
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091102
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091008
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20101031
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20101031
 
Event date:01.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59904821 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20110502
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20111116
 
Event date:30.12.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20091009
 
Event date:30.12.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20101008
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110502