Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994212

EP0994212 - Helical shearing blade [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sucker-Müller-Hacoba GmbH & Co.
Blumenberger Strasse 143-145
41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2002/19]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Sucker-Müller-Hacoba GmbH & Co.
Krefelder Strasse 690
D-41066 Mönchengladbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knein-Linz, Robert, Dr. Ing.
Hauptstrasse 81
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Frese, Beate
Patentanwältin
Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Frese-Göddeke, Beate, Dr.
Patentanwältin Hüttenallee 237b
47800 Krefeld / DE
Application number, filing date99120127.808.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814657512.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846575
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994212
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994212
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:D06C13/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Scherwendel[2000/16]
English:Helical shearing blade[2000/16]
French:Lame hélicoidale de tondeuse[2000/16]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
02.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2003Fee for grant paid
13.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE2404837  (SEVERIN FA HEUSCH) [DA] 1 * page 9, line 27 - page 11, line 20 *;
 [A]GB191412589  (TOMLINSON HAAS LTD) [A] 1 * page 4, line 7 - line 24 *;
 [A]GB722641  (NEILL JAMES & CO SHEFFIELD LTD)