Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993893

EP0993893 - Chuck for tap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emuge-Werk Richard Glimpel Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge (vormals Moschkau & Glimpel)
Nürnberger Strasse 96-100
D-91207 Lauf / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Kazda, Thomas
Salzlecke 12
91235 Hartenstein / DE
02 / Glimpel, Helmut
Gartenstrasse 6
91207 Lauf a. d. Pegnitz / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99120140.108.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814746415.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847464
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993893
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993893
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993893
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/20, B23B31/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einsatz für Gewindebohrer[2000/38]
English:Chuck for tap[2000/16]
French:Mandrin pour taraud[2000/16]
Former [2000/16]Spannfutter für Gewindebohrer
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
16.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.08.2003Fee for grant paid
21.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5636851  (KANAAN ROGER J [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2227077  (LIGONNET RENE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1; claim 1 *