Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091104

EP1091104 - Cooled pre-combustion chamber assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Divecha, Devang D.
24 Fairfield View Ct.
Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US
02 / Ginzel, Geoffrey D.
833 Brookside Drive
Lafayette, Indiana 47905 / US
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2001/15]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120156.708.10.1999
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091104
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091104
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02B19/12, F02B19/10, F01P3/16
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB [2002/01]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zusammenbau einer gekühlten Vorkammer[2001/15]
English:Cooled pre-combustion chamber assembly[2001/15]
French:Agencement d'une préchambre refroidie[2001/15]
Examination procedure20.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
01.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2005Fee for grant paid
06.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.07.2005
FR06.07.2005
GB08.10.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]FI06.07.2005
GB08.10.2005
FR31.10.2005
Former [2007/18]FI06.07.2005
GB08.10.2005
Former [2006/13]FI06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[E]US6016785  (DIVECHA DEVANG D [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * figure 1 * * column A * * column 2, line 53 - line 61 *;
 [A]JPS57153923  ;
 [A]US5222993  (CRANE MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column A *;
 [A]DE3913665  (RUHRGAS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,3 * * abstract * * claims 1-6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821218), vol. 006, no. 260, Database accession no. (M - 180), [A] 1,2 * abstract *
ExaminationJPS61138817