blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0992217

EP0992217 - Operating table system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAQUET GmbH & Co. KG
Kehler Strasse 31
76437 Rastatt / DE
[2006/07]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MAQUET Aktiengesellschaft
Kehler Strasse 31
76437 Rastatt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ballhaus, Heribert Dr.Ing.
Welser Strasse 15
90562 Heroldsberg / DE
02 / Olszewski, Jan Donat
Hermann-Müller-Würtz-Strasse 56
76189 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Sutter, Klaus
Albert Schweitzer Strasse 1/1
76437 Rastatt / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstraße 31
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120161.708.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE19982018100U09.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818100 U
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992217
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992217
Date:26.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61B6/04
[2000/15]
CPC:
A61B6/035 (EP,US); A61B6/04 (EP,US); A61G13/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Operationstischsystem[2000/15]
English:Operating table system[2000/15]
French:Système de table d'opération[2000/15]
Examination procedure15.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
05.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2006Fee for grant paid
08.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
LU08.10.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
LU08.10.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2008/21]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2008/17]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/30]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/18]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US3584321  (BUCHANAN DONALD L) [A] 1,6,8-11* column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 2 *;
 [XA]US4105923  (HYNES JR JOHN L) [X] 1-5 * column 8, line 21 - column 10, line 39 * [A] 9;
 [XA]US4131802  (BRADEN ARTHUR B, et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,11 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 67 * [A] 6;
 [A]GB2057830  (FOTHERGILL & HARVEY LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 96 - page 2, line 11 * * page 2, line 42 - line 53 *;
 [X]US4641823  (BERGMAN CHARLES T [US]) [X] 1-5,8 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 16 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.