Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993922

EP0993922 - Method for manufacturing articles from anti-adhesive polyflourcarbon powders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]Method for manufacturing articles from anti-adhesive organic powders, articles produced by the same and device for performing the method
[2007/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaco GmbH + Co.
Rosenbergstrasse 22
D-74072 Heilbronn / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Gust, Herbert
Blumenweg 26
71691 Freiberg / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Kohl, Karl-Heinz
Patentanwälte
Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl
Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl
Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Kohl, Karl-Heinz
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99120183.109.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814703213.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847032
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993922
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993922
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993922
Date:17.12.2008
Language:DE
[2008/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29B13/08, B29B9/16, // B29K27/12
[2008/02]
Former International [2001/11]B29B13/08, B29B9/16, C08J3/28, C08J7/10, // B29K27/12
Former International [2000/16]B29B13/08, B29B9/16, // B29K27/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/49]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Teilen aus pulverförmigen Polyfluorcarbonen[2008/51]
English:Method for manufacturing articles from anti-adhesive polyflourcarbon powders[2008/51]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d' objets à partir d'une matière polyfluorcarboniqée poudreuse[2008/51]
Former [2000/16]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Teilen aus Pulverförmigen antiadhäsiven organischen Stoffen, nach einem solchen Verfahren hergestelltes Teil und Gerät zur Durchführung eines solchen Verfahrens
Former [2000/16]Method for manufacturing articles from anti-adhesive organic powders, articles produced by the same and device for performing the method
Former [2000/16]Procédé pour la fabrication d' objets à partir d'une matière organique poudreuse anti-adhésive, objet fabriqué selon ce procédé et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé
Examination procedure13.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
15.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
14.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2008Fee for grant paid
28.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.11.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6341538  ;
 [X]US5234723  (BABACZ ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 5, line 52; figure 2 * * columns 1-2 *;
 [X]EP0801095  (HITACHI CABLE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-20 * pages 1-2; example 12; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE19612270  (SCHNABEL RAINER PROF DR ING HA [DE], et al) [X] 21-26 * column 3, lines 28-47; figures 1,2 * * column 5, lines 8-46 *;
 [X]DE4141805  (RHEIN BONAR KUNSTSTOFF TECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 21-26 * column 1, lines 54-63; figures 1-3; claim 17 *;
 [X]JPS59145038  ;
 [A]DE19517210  (TECNIT AG [LI]) [A] 1-26 * column 3, lines 55-64; claim 7 *;
 [A]WO9742257  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [A] 1-26 * page 2, lines 7-27; figure 1; claim 8 *;
 [X]WO9615851  (GVU GES FUER VERFAHRENSTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 21-26 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0109334  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 21-26 * page 2, line 19; figure 1 * * page 4, lines 1-19 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880715), vol. 012, no. 252, Database accession no. (C - 512), [X] 1,4-6,8-20 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841213), vol. 008, no. 273, Database accession no. (C - 256), [X] 21-26 * abstract *