blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002745

EP1002745 - Spring push-button and dispenser for tablets provided with such a push-button [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sanaro S.A.
Avenue de Savoie 56
1896 Vouvry / CH
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Cuche, Denis
1776 Montagny-la-Ville / CH
02 / Dafflon, Jacques
Rue Montsalvens 18
1636 Broc / CH
03 / Haenni, Werner
En Béguex 12
1816 Chailly / CH
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99120194.809.10.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateCH1998000230017.11.1998         Original published format: CH 230098
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002745
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:B65D83/04, F16F1/18
[2000/21]
CPC:
F16F1/18 (EP); B65D83/0409 (EP); B65D2583/0481 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2001/06]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Federbelasteter Drücker und mit einem solchen Drücker ausgerüstete Tabletten-Spendereinrichtung[2000/21]
English:Spring push-button and dispenser for tablets provided with such a push-button[2000/21]
French:Bouton-poussoir avec ressort et distributeur de pillules comportant un tel bouton-poussoir[2000/21]
Examination procedure09.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
25.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE
19.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
10.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5667276  (CONNELLY ET AL.) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]FR2566077  (KEDVES) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]EP0199900  (BRAMLAGE) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0078126  (THE BOOTS) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0583956  (MANUPLASTICS) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9621111  (HAAS) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.