Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995626

EP0995626 - Modular bearing for actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Weis, Christian
Am Lemmchen 31A
55120 Mainz / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2000/17]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99120199.709.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814809319.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848093
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995626
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995626
Date:17.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K26/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lagermodul für ein Betätigungselement[2000/17]
English:Modular bearing for actuator[2000/17]
French:Palier modulaire pour dispositif de commande[2000/17]
Examination procedure25.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
19.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
21.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
07.05.2003Fee for grant paid
07.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2003Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
22.05.2003Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
23.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)20.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50]
Request for further processing for:07.05.2003Request for further processing filed
07.05.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request procedure closed
22.05.2003Decision despatched
23.10.2002Request for further processing filed
23.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.12.2003
GB17.12.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/45]GB17.12.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4300096  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4426549  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19517172
 DE19737289