Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004535

EP1004535 - Method for operating an automatic cross-winding machine during batch changing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saurer GmbH & Co. KG
Landgrafenstrasse 45
41069 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2003/42]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO.
Blumenberger Strasse 143-145
D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mund, Manfred
Neustrasse 25
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / Heines, Michael
Bischof-Peters-Strasse 55
41334 Nettetal / DE
03 / Iding, Michael
Schoppenweg 23
47608 Geldern / DE
04 / Forche, Torsten
Ahornweg 3
46499 Dingden / DE
05 / Terörde, Stefan
Blumenstrasse 37
46499 Hamminkeln/Dingden / DE
06 / Theele, Bernd-Rüdiger
Lütticher Strasse 561
52074 Aachen / DE
07 / Holt, John-Adrian
Lessingstrasse 1a
41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
08 / Lindemann, Heinz-Peter
Planckstrasse 61
47877 Willich / DE
[2000/22]
Application number, filing date99120208.609.10.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815437525.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19854375
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004535
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004535
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004535
Date:02.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65H67/06
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2001/34]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kreuzspulautomaten bei Partiewechsel[2000/22]
English:Method for operating an automatic cross-winding machine during batch changing[2000/22]
French:Procédé de fonctionnement d'un bobinoir à fil croisé automatique pendant le changement de lot[2000/22]
Examination procedure06.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
07.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2003Fee for grant paid
18.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4233819  (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 39 *;
 [A]EP0534229  (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 5; claim - *