Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969160

EP0969160 - Covering for building [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider & Co. Leichtbausysteme
Gewerbezentrum Freihof
9204 Andwil / CH
For all designated states
Flumroc AG
Industriestrasse
8890 Flums / CH
[2002/26]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Schneider & Co.
Leichtbausysteme Gewerbezentrum Freihof
9204 Andwil / CH
For all designated states
Flumroc AG
Industriestrasse
8890 Flums / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Winteler, Hans
Amperdellstrasse 6
8887 Mels / CH
02 / Schneider, Walter
Dorfstrasse 79
9204 Andwil / CH
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Riederer, Conrad A. , et al
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. , et al
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Bahnhofstrasse 10
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
Application number, filing date99120234.209.04.1998
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateCH1997000142011.06.1997         Original published format: CH 142097
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969160
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969160
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969160
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04D13/16, E04D3/362
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Gebäudehülle[2000/01]
English:Covering for building[2000/01]
French:Couverture de bâtiment[2000/01]
Examination procedure11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
02.04.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
18.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.07.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2002Fee for grant paid
21.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98810303.2  / EP0854252
Opposition(s)27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2000
01.05.200104   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.06.2002
GB26.06.2002
IE26.06.2002
IT26.06.2002
DK26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FR26.06.2002
GB26.06.2002
IE26.06.2002
DK26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2004/05]GB26.06.2002
IE26.06.2002
DK26.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2003/46]GB26.06.2002
IE26.06.2002
DK26.09.2002
Former [2003/29]GB26.06.2002
IE26.06.2002
Former [2003/17]GB26.06.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0685612  (PROECKL GERTHOLD DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 9 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5363624  (COTTER DONALD P [US]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]DE9110169U  (G+H MONTAGE) [A] 9 * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 4; figure 2 *