Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994171

EP0994171 - Light-blocking anisotropically electroconductive adhesive film, and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Chemical & Information Device Corporation
Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F, 1-11-2, Osaki, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
[2007/02]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Sony Chemicals Corporation
6-3, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0022 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suga, Yasuhiro, c/o SONY CHEMICALS CORPORATION
12-3 Satsuki-cho
Kanuma-shi, Tochigi 322-8502 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120274.811.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998028959012.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28959098
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994171
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994171
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994171
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09J9/02, C09J11/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/25]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lichtblockierender, anisotrop elektrisch leitfähiger Klebstofffilm und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung[2007/42]
English:Light-blocking anisotropically electroconductive adhesive film, and liquid crystal display device[2000/16]
French:Film adhésif opaque à électroconductivité anisotrope et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides[2000/16]
Former [2000/16]Anisotropisch elektrischleitender Verdunklungsklebefilm und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung
Examination procedure29.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
10.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2005Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2005Fee for grant paid
26.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH01113480  ;
 [A]EP0099228  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US5336443  (ODASHIMA SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-6 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890727), vol. 013, no. 336, Database accession no. (C - 623), [A] 1-7 * abstract *