Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992319

EP0992319 - Machining system using a chip conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]Chip conveyor and machining system using the same
[2006/43]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirano, Hidekazu
JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
02 / Arai, Yoshihiro
JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
03 / Nishikayama, Takeshi
JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku Osaka / JP
 [2006/47]
Former [2000/15]01 / Hirano, Hidekazu, c/o TOYODA KOKI K.K.
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Arai, Yoshihiro, c/o TOYODA KOKI K.K.
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Nishikayama, Takeshi, c/o TOYODA KOKI K.K.
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/15]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120281.311.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028791409.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28791498
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992319
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992319
Date:09.04.2003
[2003/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992319
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B23Q11/00, B23Q41/00, B23Q41/02
[2003/15]
Former International [2000/15]B23Q11/00, B23Q41/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/02]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bearbeitungssystem mit Späneförderer[2006/43]
English:Machining system using a chip conveyor[2006/43]
French:Système d'usinage ultilisant un convoyeur de copeaux[2006/43]
Former [2000/15]Späneförderer und Bearbeitungssystem damit
Former [2000/15]Chip conveyor and machining system using the same
Former [2000/15]Convoyeur de copeaux et système d'usinage en l'ultilisant
Examination procedure24.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
15.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2007Fee for grant paid
07.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07124842  ;
 [XA]US4380284  (ITO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 7 * column 2, line 49 - line 51 * * figure - * [A] 2,3,9,10;
 [Y]US4655664  (FEICHTL ROLAND [AT], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,8,11-13 * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 4, line 28 - line 41 * * column 4, line 65 - line 67 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2056399  (ARBOGA MEK VERK AB) [A] 1,7,15 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 22 - line 26 * * page 1, line 81 - line 109 * * page 2, line 44 - line 55 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4309600  (PERRY CHARLES B, et al) [A] 2,9 * column 15, line 41 - column 16, line 42 * * figures 11-14 *;
 [A]US4237598  (WILLIAMSON DAVID T [GB]) [A] 1,5,8,12 * column 1, line 16 - line 29 * * column 2, line 43 - line 54 * * column 8, line 37 - line 65 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3722180  (CROSS EUROPA WERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 4,6,11,13 * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 31 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]JPH0899249  ;
 [A]JPH06106443
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, [X] 7,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 1,4-6,8,11-13
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, [A] 14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940718), vol. 018, no. 380, Database accession no. (M - 1639), [A] 1,7,15 * abstract *